U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Devoe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [USCA Time Schedule Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [USCA Case Number ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf]
  • March 31, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 19, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 18, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • August 02, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order of Release]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 06, 2022: [Bail Review Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Vacate ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Memo to the Court (Sealed PDF)]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • June 02, 2022: [Hearing ]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Clerks Notice]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned -JDR Retired]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 18, 2021: [Status Conference]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Scheduling Conference ]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order]
  • July 22, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 20, 2020: [Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 17, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order Amending Progression Order]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 26, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • June 26, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 26, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 26, 2020: [Notice of Arrest]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order - Sealed pdf]
  • June 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 26, 2020: [Indictment - For Public]
  • June 26, 2020: [Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)]
  • June 25, 2020: [Docket Annotation - Indictment Filed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.