open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

ALASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00207
    Party Name:Northern Alaska Environmental Center et al v. Bernhardt et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Unissued Summons]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.akd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?64899
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =