U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Endsley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Status Report]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 18, 2022: [Transcript]
  • December 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • December 08, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • December 08, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Status Report]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 28, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • November 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2022: [1 - Set/Reset Hearings (Private Entry)]
  • November 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Private Entry)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Witness List Public Doc]
  • November 21, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • November 21, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 30, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 24, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 18, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 25, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 08, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • July 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 24, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • May 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order of Release]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2022: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • March 17, 2022: [Third Party Custodian Report]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 28, 2022: [Affidavit]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Amended Minute Entry]
  • October 13, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Response in Support]
  • September 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Substitute Attorney ]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 06, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 01, 2021: [Right to Speedy Trial Act/FSA Acknowledgment & Waiver]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 27, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice of Defendant in State Custody]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.