U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00124
  • Case Name: Alaina Clark
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Compensation / Professional Fees]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Compensation / Professional Fees]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Report of Sale]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Sell Property (Under Sec 363(b))]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • March 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Employ]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.