U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-00155
  • Case Name: Eric Duane Peterson and Rebeca Elizabeth Peterson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.