U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 07, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2025
  • February 20, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.