U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00091-8
  • Case Name: USA v. Quintana et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 30, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Unopposed Motion]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Bail Review Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 29, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 24, 2025: [PSIReferred]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • April 23, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 23, 2025: [PSIReferred]
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Request No Action]
  • April 10, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 09, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • April 09, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Memo to the Court (Sealed PDF)]
  • April 07, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 03, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • March 27, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • March 27, 2025: [Memo to the Court (Sealed PDF)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Hearing ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Request for Modification]
December, 2024
  • December 04, 2024: [Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf]
  • October 10, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Request No Action]
  • October 07, 2024: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.