U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00031
  • Case Name: Bradshaw v. Wade et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: [Unissued Summons]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 28, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • March 28, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order]
February, 2025
  • February 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 10, 2025: [Errata]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)]
  • October 07, 2024: [1 - Summons Issued]
  • October 07, 2024: [Unissued Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.