U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order of Release]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 30, 2025: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Memo to the Court (Sealed PDF)]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 24, 2025: [Unopposed Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 22, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 22, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [PSIReferred]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Hearing ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • April 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Right to Speedy Trial Act/FSA Acknowledgment & Waiver]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 09, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 09, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Memo to the Court (Sealed PDF)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.