U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00183
  • Case Name: Bank of America, N.A. v. Blas et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • April 21, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • April 09, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Strike]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 24, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2024: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • October 08, 2024: [Substitute Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.