U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-90006
  • Case Name: Hrin et al v. Hayes et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • May 05, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic) (SA)]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio File (Active Event)]
March, 2025
  • March 04, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio File (Active Event)]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Proceeding Memo]
  • October 10, 2024: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Setting Trial (SA)]
  • October 10, 2024: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio File (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.