U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-90001
  • Case Name: Cosme, II v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Appeal - Clerks Notice Regarding Status of Appeal]
  • April 10, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • April 07, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Appellee Designation of Record]
  • April 07, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Statement of Issues on Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Under Advisement Deadline & Flag]
  • March 29, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Appeal - Clerks Receipt of Transmittal or Transfer of Appeal (BKA12)]
  • March 27, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stay Pending Appeal]
  • March 26, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Appeal - Clerks Notice of Requirements for Perfection of Appeal]
  • March 26, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Appeal - Clerks Notice of Filing Appeal and Transmittal]
  • March 26, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Emergency/Ex parte Motion Referral]
  • March 25, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stay Pending Appeal (CM34)]
  • March 25, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Fee) (BKA04)]
  • March 14, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 13, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Update Debtor Information]
  • March 13, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Change of Address]
  • March 12, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment (NOT For Dismissal - Adv Non-NID) (SA)]
  • March 12, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Memorandum Decision (Opinions Site) (SA)]
October, 2024
  • October 19, 2024: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.