U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sledge
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 23, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 09, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 13, 2025: [Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)]
October, 2024
  • October 30, 2024: [In Limine ]
  • October 21, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.