U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00191
  • Case Name: Stephanie Anne Dickerson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Change of Address]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Add Attorney]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Setting Hearing (SA)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Reconsider]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of Intent to Deny]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Request for Exemption from Participation in Credit Counseling or Debtor Education Course]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Request for Exemption from Participation in Credit Counseling or Debtor Education Course (LBF42)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Comply (SA)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Affidavit of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of Intent to Deny]
February, 2025
  • February 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Emergency/Ex parte Motion Referral]
  • February 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Objection to Claim of Exemptions (CM46-COAwith)]
January, 2025
  • January 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • January 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Update Debtor Information]
  • January 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
November, 2024
  • November 21, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Update Matrix]
  • November 14, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • November 14, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)]
  • November 01, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.