U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00201
  • Case Name: Cynthia Lynn Burrill
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
February, 2025
  • February 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
December, 2024
  • December 27, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
November, 2024
  • November 29, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.