U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00203
  • Case Name: William Henry Vaughn, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Transfer of Claim Fee Paid]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Withdrawal of Document / Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
February, 2025
  • February 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
January, 2025
  • January 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • December 16, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Extend Time]
  • December 02, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.