U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00277
  • Case Name: Tunkara v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response to Order]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2024
  • December 02, 2024: [Witness List]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.