U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00052
  • Case Name: Aaron Adam Pimm
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Trustees Final Report (TFR)]
February, 2025
  • February 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Compensation / Professional Fees]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Report of Sale]
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Compensation / Professional Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.