U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00120
  • Case Name: Wilma Eribal Tanner and Roy Delton Tanner, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Setting Hearing (SA)]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Transfer of Claim Fee Paid]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Clerk Declaration re Power of Attorney]
January, 2025
  • January 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • January 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • December 27, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 26, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF38)]
  • December 23, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • December 17, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.