U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00208
  • Case Name: George Robert Yoder
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
January, 2025
  • January 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • January 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • January 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.