U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00005
  • Case Name: Russell Thomas Gearhart and Roberta Jane Gearhart
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (SA)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance)]
January, 2025
  • January 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.