U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Severance
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Private Entry)]
  • April 08, 2025: [1 - Set/Reset Hearings (Private Entry)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Trial Scheduling Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Unopposed Motion]
January, 2025
  • January 23, 2025: [Notice of Defendant in State Custody]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.