U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00010
  • Case Name: Howard William Andree
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
January, 2025
  • January 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
  • January 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.