U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00015
  • Case Name: Jacklyn April Powers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Document Served Conventionally By Mail or By Email]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice Requiring Original Signature]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
February, 2025
  • February 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
January, 2025
  • January 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.