U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00016
  • Case Name: William Cody Yager
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Order (Generic) (SA)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
February, 2025
  • February 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2025
  • January 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.