U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez-Rodriguez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reconsideration ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 20, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
February, 2025
  • February 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.