U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00014
  • Case Name: Jali Eduardo Estrella
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.