U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00019
  • Case Name: Kameron Casi Kron
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Calendar Remark (Settled / Removed)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Withdrawal of Document / Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Update Debtor Information]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Update Matrix]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Verification of Creditor Mailing Matrix (LBF40)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Schedules A-J]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Amended Voluntary Petition]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Extend Time]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Continue / Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Extend Time]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Continue / Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Emergency/Ex parte Motion Referral]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Continue / Reschedule Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Request for Special Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Extend Time]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Extend Time]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Motion to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)]
February, 2025
  • February 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • February 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.