U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00022
  • Case Name: Norman Lee Walker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Request for Special Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.