U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daniels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf]
  • April 21, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf]
  • March 18, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2025
  • February 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.