U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00026
  • Case Name: Lucas M Judkins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - USTs Statement of Presumed Abuse]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Statement of Declination]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Statement of Presumed Abuse (ST1) (BNC Notice)]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
  • March 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • March 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.