U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00024
  • Case Name: Pamela Jeanne Miller
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • March 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
  • March 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.