U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00028
  • Case Name: Harley Richard Kaina Danner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Dismissing Case (SA)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAwith) (SA)]
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAwith) (SA)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.