open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:0:14-bk-17129-
    Party Name:Abdullah Ilyaas Ali and Ashanti Elise Ali
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Close Bankruptcy Case (ALL)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Final Report - Completed Case (Chapter 13) (batch)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Form Request--Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Certificate of Eligibility for Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Discharge Notice to Debtor (BAPCPA Case)]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Trustee Notice of Completed Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Financial Management Course Certificate (batch)]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Motion to Dismiss (Chapter 13) (batch)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Assignment/Transfer of Claim with Waiver of Notice (or Notice of)(25.00 fee)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:February 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Trustee Notice of Submitting Order]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Recommendation Amended/Modified Plan or Moratorium (Chapter 13) (batch)]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Trustee Annual Report]
    Date Published:October 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Modified Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
    Date Published:September 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Change of Address]
    Date Published:September 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oConfirming Chapter 13/12 Plan]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 0 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?684812
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =