open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:14-cv-00670
    Party Name:Drake et al v. Eloy, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacate ]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document ]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?852963
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =