open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:15-cv-00964
    Party Name:VIP Construction Incorporated v. Town of Queen Creek et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:May 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:May 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings ]
    Date Published:March 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees ]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Quash ]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quash ]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only)]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:December 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:October 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings ]
    Date Published:September 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Minute Entry]
    Date Published:August 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:August 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ]
    Date Published:April 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:April 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Expedite ]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Facts]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief (Non Appeal)]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference ]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?927082
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =