open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:16-cv-02246
    Party Name:Hulet v. Gilbert, Town of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:August 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?989791
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =