Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:17-cv-02468
    Party Name:Surgenex LLC v. Regenerative Sciences LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:March 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacate]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:January 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:November 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
    Date Published:November 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:November 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:October 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:October 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:October 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
    Date Published:September 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request ]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [MIDP - Order of Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:September 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:September 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:September 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1044869
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =