open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05287
    Party Name:Thunderbird Downtown LLC v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application ]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1205533
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =