open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-01285
    Party Name:Meadows Of Wickenburg Incorporated et al v. UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:July 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:July 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:July 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1243567
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =