U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00061
  • Case Name: Offen Petroleum LLC v. L&J Express LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Answer to Amended Counterclaim]
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Amended Counterclaim]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 18, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Disclosure]
  • April 01, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 31, 2025: [Crossclaim ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 24, 2025: [Crossclaim ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Dismiss Case]
  • March 24, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Statement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Crossclaim ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline ]
  • March 14, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
  • March 14, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 13, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 12, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 12, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Counterclaim ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.