U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-00090-
  • Case Name: HARRIET KOCHEE HEMERLING
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oOther Order to be Mailed to Interested Parties by BNC]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oRelief from Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Final Installment]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Receipt for Overage]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.