U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-00400-
  • Case Name: SHAUN MICHAEL ROTHE and BLAKE LANAE PEARSON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Claims Bar Date and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--Notice of Claims Bar Date]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Request to Set Claims Bar Date (batch)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Reaffirmation Agreement/Declaration of Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/34.00 Fee)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Objection to Exempt Property]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.