U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-00226-
  • Case Name: DAVID FRANK DUNBAR and PAULA ILENE DUNBAR
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice of Hearing - VAN Form]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Reaffirmation Agreement - Pro Se Debtor]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Withdrawal]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Objection to Exempt Property]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.