U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-bk-09302-
  • Case Name: JEFFREY A HOLBERT and CRYSTAL DENISE HOLBERT
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Compel Abandonment (Motion to) (199.00 fee)]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oRelief from Stay]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.