U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00507-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Dreckmeier et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Adopting MJ Findings and Recommendation]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Dispositional Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Continue Dispositional Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Magistrate Judge Findings & Recommendation]
  • April 25, 2025: [Admit/Deny Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Consent of Defendant for Hearing Before a Magistrate Judge]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text Only)]
  • April 07, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.