U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-40003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Doggett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 04, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [Sealed Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.