U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cr-60034-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Justice et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
January, 2025
  • January 16, 2025: [Psychiatric Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.