U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00007-13
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Travel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2025: [Pretrial Discovery Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Bond]
  • March 28, 2025: [Pretrial Discovery Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Protective Order]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.