U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-10385
  • Case Name: Diane Renee Cochran and Gary Dean Cochran
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing Continued (Courtroom)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Borrow / Incur]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Submit]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Borrow / Incur]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Objection to Confirmation of Modified Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.